Finlay, Karen (CPSO#: 63655)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 42562
Fax: (905) 575-2660
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Hamilton ON  L8J 3W2
Canada
Phone: 905 387 4551
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
2000 Credit Valley Rd Suite 103
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Canada
Phone: 908 828 2066
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Wellington Imaging (Niagara)
589 Lake Street (Lower)
St Catharines ON  L2N 7L6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

CIBC Breast Assessment Centre
711 Concession Street East
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Finlay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Finlay ( CPSO# 63655 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Henderson Division
711 Concession Street East
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN FINLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINLAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1992