Finlay, Marisa Heather Des Mazes (CPSO#: 74898)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: Des Mazes, Marisa Heather (used until: 04 Jul 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Site
Department of Oncology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 4803
Fax: (905) 813-3962
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marisa Finlay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Finlay ( CPSO# 74898 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Site
Department of Oncology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3S7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 14 May 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARISA HEATHER DES MAZES FINLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINLAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2007