Finlayson, Judith Elizabeth (CPSO#: 28434)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: RSRS www.GetMyMedRecord.ca or Phone: 1-888-563-3732 Ext 1
Date Received: 19 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDITH ELIZABETH FINLAYSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINLAYSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1975 to 13 Jun 1976
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1976 to 31 Dec 1976
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 10 Jan 1977 to 04 Jul 1977
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 2007