Finley, John Powers (CPSO#: 46060)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 Mar 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Mar 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 1 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Mar 1998