Finley, Richard John (CPSO#: 26262)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Oct 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Oct 1992