Finn, Stephanie Kate (CPSO#: 76762)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Names: Ashe, Stephanie Kate (used until: 15 Aug 2010 )     Finn, Stephanie Kate (used until: 08 Apr 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dixie Road Medical Associates
2200 Dixie Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1Z4
Phone: (905) 279-1700
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Finn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Finn ( CPSO# 76762 )

Business Address:
Dixie Road Medical Associates
2200 Dixie Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1Z4
Phone Number: (905) 279-1700

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE KATE FINN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2001