Finnegan, Andrew Paul Joseph (CPSO#: 26484)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 15 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Dec 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Paul Finnegan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 22 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 15 Dec 2014

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Dec 2014
Summary:

 On December 15, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Finnegan committed an act of 
 professional misconduct, in that he sexually abused a patient; and that he has engaged in conduct 
 or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional. Dr. Finnegan admitted to the allegations.

Patient A attended for psychoanalysis 
 at Dr. Finnegan’s office from December 1983 to April 1995. Between the Fall of 1994 and April 
 1995, Dr. Finnegan and Patient A had a sexual relationship involving sexual intercourse on a 
 regular basis, while still continuing their psychoanalytic relationship. Patient A ended the 
 psychoanalytic relationship in April 1995. This relationship continued up until 2003 when Dr. 
 Finnegan broke off the relationship with Patient A.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed 
 that:
• the Registrar revoke Dr. Finnegan’s certificate of registration effective immediately. 
• 
 Dr. Finnegan appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
• Dr. Finnegan post an irrevocable letter 
 of credit or other security acceptable to the College by January 15, 2015 in the amount of 
 $16,060.00 in order to reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program 
 required under section 85.7 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule “A” to 
 the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991.
• Dr. Finnegan pay costs to the College in the amount 
 of $4,460 by January 15, 2015.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): December 15, -2014