Finner, Natalie Samantha (CPSO#: 103957)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Limerick, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
Pediatric Department
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIE SAMANTHA FINNER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. FINNER is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. FINNER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FINNER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. FINNER shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. FINNER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. FINNER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018