Fioret, Philip William (CPSO#: 50555)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 1997