Fiorillo, Victor Joseph (CPSO#: 55464)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Dec 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Columbia Medical Arts
8333 Weston Road
Suite 205
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone: (905) 856-4331
Fax: (905) 856-4360
Electoral District: 05

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1986
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2006
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 10 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 12 Dec 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 12 Dec 2013 Active View Details [+]
            As from December 12, 2013, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Victor Joseph
            Fiorillo, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Fiorillo
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Fiorillo is prohibited from practising in relation to Cannabis, as
                  defined by Schedule II to the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act (S.C.
                  1996, c. 19) ("Cannabis"), including, without in any way limiting the
                  generality of this restriction, 
                  i.    The prescription, dispensing or administration of Cannabis; 
                  ii.   Signing medical declarations pursuant to the Medical Marihuana
                        Access Regulations, SOR/2001-227 or any equivalent documents
                        pursuant to such statutes and/or regulations as may come into force
                        at a future time (collectively, "Marihuana Documents"), or
                        participating in any way in the preparation, issuance or support of
                        Marihuana Documents, save and except for the sole and limited
                        purpose of referring patients to other healthcare providers in
                        relation to medical marihuana; or
                  iii.  The counselling, assessment or treatment of patients in relation to
                        Cannabis, save and except for the sole and limited purpose of
                        referring patients to other healthcare providers for such
                        counselling, assessment or treatment.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Jun 2006

 On June 22, 2006, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Fiorillo committed an act of professional 
 misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 1991, 
 in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having 
 regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional by altering a patient record and not informing the College of the 
 alterations when questioned about the contemporaneity of his notes in the course of an 

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

(	The Registrar suspend Dr. 
 Fiorillo's certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months, two (2) months of which 
 shall be suspended if Dr. Fiorillo successfully completes, at his own expense, the College's 
 Medical RecordKeeping Course on the next available date and the College's Medical Ethics Course 
 within sixty (60) days from the date of the release of the reasons of the Discipline Committee in 
 this matter and provides proof thereof to the College.  The commencement date for the suspension 
 is July 10, 2006.

(	Dr. Fiorillo appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

(	Dr. Fiorillo to 
 pay to the College costs in the amount of $10,000.00 within ninety (90) days of the date of this 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 22, 2006