Fiorino, Leathia Helena (CPSO#: 100160)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 May 2013 to 29 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2015 to 25 Sep 2015
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2015