Firstbrook, Peggy Jane (CPSO#: 33280)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Dec 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1997