Firus, Jessica Lauren (CPSO#: 106815)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  20 Nov 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's Family Health Team
Department of Family Medicine
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone: (613) 533-9300
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA LAUREN FIRUS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. FIRUS is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. FIRUS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FIRUS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. FIRUS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. FIRUS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. FIRUS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 20 Nov 2017.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 20 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Nov 2017