Fisch, Laura Naomi (CPSO#: 72480)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
85 The East Mall
Suite 400
Toronto ON  M8Z 5W4
Phone: (416) 621-2220
Fax: 416 621 2203
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Fisch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Fisch ( CPSO# 72480 )

Business Address:
400 - 85 The East Mall
Toronto ON  M9B 3Z9
Phone Number: (416) 621-2220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA NAOMI FISCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2000