Fischer, Corinne Eleanor (CPSO#: 67362)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
17-044 Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5320
Fax: (416) 864-5480
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Aug 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CORINNE ELEANOR FISCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISCHER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Aug 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 12 Aug 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1998