Fischer, David Andrew (CPSO#: 64986)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 108
115 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 5G1
Phone: (705) 727-7650
Fax: (705) 727-7670
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fischer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fischer ( CPSO# 64986 )
Dr. K. Fischer ( CPSO# 66568 )

Business Address:
Suite 108
115 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 5G1
Phone Number: (705) 727-7650

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 02 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW FISCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISCHER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Clinical Immunology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993