Fischer, Desmond Lawrence (CPSO#: 33130)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 10 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 30 Oct 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013