Fischer, Gerhardt Ernest (CPSO#: 21939)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Lockwood Clinic Tel: 416- 921-2121
Date Received: 24 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013