Fischer, Howard Lloyd (CPSO#: 71148)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6520
Fax: (416) 756-6582
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Howard L. Fischer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Fischer ( CPSO# 71148 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
4001 Leslie Street
Suite 1SE-157
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6520

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD LLOYD FISCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISCHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002