Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Fischer, Krista Lynn (CPSO#: 66568)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: Cope, Krista Lynn (used until: 17 Jul 1995 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fischer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fischer ( CPSO# 64986 )
Dr. K. Fischer ( CPSO# 66568 )

Business Address:
Suite 108
115 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 5G1
Phone Number: (705) 727-7650

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTA LYNN FISCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISCHER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2004