Fischer, Lynn Marie (CPSO#: 57046)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: Fischer-Ingram, Lynn Marie (used until: 24 Jun 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
24 Fairfax Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 0T2
Phone: (613) 883-5923
Fax: 613-482-5666
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYNN MARIE FISCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISCHER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1987