Fischer, Marc Anthony (CPSO#: 68425)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 419
1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone: (905) 529-5910
Fax: (905) 529-7604
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

ONE FERTILITY
3210 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3T1
Canada
Phone: (905) 634-4440
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Reproductive Care Centre
2180 Meadowvale Road
Mississauga ON  L5N 5S3
Canada
Phone: (905) 816-8922
Fax: (905) 816-9833
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.A. Fischer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 15 2016


Corporation Name: Marc A. Fischer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fischer ( CPSO# 68425 )

Business Address:
Unit 419
1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone Number: (905) 529-5910

Business Address:
ISIS Regional Fertility Centre
2180 Meadowvale Road
Mississauga ON  L5N 5S3
Phone Number: (905) 816-9822

Business Address:
3210 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3T1
Phone Number: (905) 634-4440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 21 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC ANTHONY FISCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISCHER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1996