Fish, Joel Steven (CPSO#: 56979)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Room 5410 - Black Wing
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 228198
Fax: 416 813 8502
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fish Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fish ( CPSO# 56979 )

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
Room 5410 - Black Wing
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-9587

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL STEVEN FISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2010