Fish, Kevin James (CPSO#: 28715)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 1997