Fish, Marjorie Doreen Cowan (CPSO#: 16614)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 15 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 1958
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999