Fishell, Alicja Dorota (CPSO#: 70325)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jan 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
7th Floor
Department of Psychiatry
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6230
Fax: (416) 323-6356
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Godden Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 4S5
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 05 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALICJA DOROTA FISHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISHELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Sep 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2003