Fisher, Andrea Anthony (CPSO#: 18497)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 12 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jul 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Mar 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 2012

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 12, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Andrea Anthony Fisher to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Membership Department):

I, Dr. Fisher:

(1) Certificate of registration number 18497, was a member of the College between August 23, 1979 and July 12, 2012. My certificate of registration expired on July 12, 2012.

(2) Acknowledge that, as of the date of this Undertaking, I am the subject of an investigation by the College regarding my practice of hyperbaric medicine (the “Investigation”).

(3) Acknowledge that there has been no referral to the Discipline Committee of the College in respect of the Investigation and that the concerns arising in the Investigation were not proven before the Discipline Committee.

(4) Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a certificate of registration to practise medicine in Ontario.

(5) Hereby undertake not to practice hyperbaric medicine in any jurisdiction.

(6) Agree that if that the College becomes aware that I have applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a certificate of registration/licence to practise medicine in breach of this Undertaking, or that I have practiced hyperbaric medicine, the College shall, in its sole discretion, have the right to re-commence the Investigation which was terminated as a result of this Undertaking, and/or proceed with a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.

(12) Give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution who may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.

(13) Consent to the terms of this Undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.