Fisher, Barbara Jean (CPSO#: 30807)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 685-8650
Fax: (519) 685-8627
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barbara J. Fisher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Fisher ( CPSO# 30807 )

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Centre
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8650

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 01 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA JEAN FISHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISHER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1985