Fisher, Christina Maria (CPSO#: 68276)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Forest Hill Medical Center
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: (416) 782-6111
Fax: (416) 782-5515
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA MARIA FISHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISHER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1996