Fisher, David Malcolm (CPSO#: 72817)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Suite 5424
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6445
Fax: (416) 813-6147
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David M. Fisher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fisher ( CPSO# 72817 )

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
Suite 5424
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 24 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MALCOLM FISHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999