Fisher, Garry Ford (CPSO#: 20743)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 217 Woodland Drive Simcoe ON N3Y 4K3
Date Received: 17 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016