Fisher, Leeona (CPSO#: 63744)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jerusalem Medical Center
Diskin 9A
Jerusalem 9644010
Israel
Phone: 972-2-5636265
Fax: 972-2-5619686

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEEONA FISHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1992