Fisher, Marnie Elizabeth (CPSO#: 73244)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1000
1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone: (416) 231-0100
Fax: (416) 231-0109
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARNIE ELIZABETH FISHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 1999 to 07 Feb 1999
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Feb 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2003