Fisher, Murray Malcolm (CPSO#: 17683)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1963

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1963

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone: (416) 926-0262 Ext. 225
Fax: (416) 926-0936
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.M. Fisher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fisher ( CPSO# 17683 )

Business Address:
Upper Canada Lower Bowel Clinic
Suite 301
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 926-0262

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MURRAY MALCOLM FISHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISHER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1963