Fisher, Myles Gordon William (CPSO#: 26768)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Glazier Medical Centre 11 Gibb Street Oshawa, ON L1H 2J9
Date Received: 11 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Apr 2017