Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Fisher, Rebecca (CPSO#: 69898)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-2328
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2026 tenth line road
orleans
Ottawa ON  K1Y 2X2
Canada
Phone: (613) 834-5656
Fax: (613) 834-3412
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

1432 Wellington street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 2X2
Canada
Phone: (613) 722-2929
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rebecca Fisher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Fisher ( CPSO# 69898 )

Business Address:
Emergency Department
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-2328

Business Address:
B1 - 2026 Tenth Line Road
Orleans ON  K4A 4X4
Phone Number: (613) 834-5656

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA FISHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISHER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1998