Fisher, Rory Henry Grattan (CPSO#: 24096)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Sunnybrook Health Science Centre 2075 Bayview Avenue Toronto, ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 29 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015