Fisher, Walter Godfrey Guest (CPSO#: 26270)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 617 Forest Hill Drive, KIngston, ON K7M 7N6
Date Received: 12 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015