Fisman, Michael Zed (CPSO#: 28813)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Oct 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Oct 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute
550 Wellington Rd
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 455-5110 Ext. 47376
Fax: (519) 455-7151
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sandra N. Fisman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fisman ( CPSO# 28813 )
Dr. S. Fisman ( CPSO# 30365 )

Business Address:
Parkwood Institute
H5 - 550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
B8-150
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6671

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ZED FISMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1976