Fitch, Nancy Katharine (CPSO#: 70589)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Marathon Family Health Team
P O Box 399
22 Peninsula Road
Marathon ON  P0T 2E0
Phone: (807) 229-3243
Fax: (807) 229-2672
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fitch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Fitch ( CPSO# 70589 )

Business Address:
Marathon Family Health Team
22 Peninsula Road
Marathon ON  P0T 2E0
Phone Number: (807) 229-3243

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Yukon

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Manitouwadge General Hospital Manitouwadge
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY KATHARINE FITCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FITCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 23 Jan 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1998