Fiture, Ali Otman (CPSO#: 63023)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Oct 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 1997

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
York Med
250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite 305
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 787-0303
Fax: (905) 787-0404
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ali Otman Fiture Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fiture ( CPSO# 63023 )

Business Address:
York Med
250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite 305
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 787-0303

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 10 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI OTMAN FITURE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FITURE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 6 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Dec 1998 to 31 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1997
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1997

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On October 3, 2017, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice, Newmarket, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Ali Otman Fiture in respect of an incident that took place in May 2000.