Fituri, Rasem Lasmar (CPSO#: 76610)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Phone: (519) 256-2993
Fax: (519) 256-9465
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital,
Metropolitean Campus
GI Endoscopy Unit
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Ext. 52019
Fax: (519) 985-2603
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fituri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Fituri ( CPSO# 76610 )

Business Address:
700 Tecumseh Road East
Suite 202
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Phone Number: (519) 256-2993

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitean Campus
GI Endoscopy Unit
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 May 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 21 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RASEM LASMAR FITURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FITURI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2007