Fitzgerald, Catherine Ann (CPSO#: 65814)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998