Fitzgerald, Gerald William Norman (CPSO#: 24933)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Nov 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 2000