Fitzgerald, John Marcus (CPSO#: 54483)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gaelic

Education:National University of Ireland, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 1998