Fitzpatrick, Alanna Victoria (CPSO#: 100683)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: Borris, Alanna Victoria (used until: 06 Mar 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
Department of Plastic Surgery
711 Concession St, Hamilton, ON
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C1
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALANNA VICTORIA FITZPATRICK shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. FITZPATRICK is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. FITZPATRICK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FITZPATRICK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. FITZPATRICK shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. FITZPATRICK is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. FITZPATRICK no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018