Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Fitzpatrick, Kelly Patricia (CPSO#: 69393)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 12
1300 Garth Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 4L7
Phone: (905) 575-0611
Fax: (905) 575-7737
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Treleaven Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fitzpatrick ( CPSO# 69393 )
Dr. D. Treleaven ( CPSO# 69394 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLY PATRICIA FITZPATRICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FITZPATRICK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999