Fitzsimmons, Phyllis Eileen (CPSO#: 24045)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: For those patients who intend to continue on with Dr. Mingo and have seen either Dr. Fitzsimmons or Dr. Mingo since January 1, 2009, the records will be moved to: Suite 212 600 Sherbourne Street Toronto, ON M4X 1W4 For those patients who have not seen either Dr. Fitzsimmons or Dr. Mingo since January 1, 2009, the Records will be stored at: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 07 Jul 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011