Fitzsimons, Carrie Lynn (CPSO#: 68447)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006