Flageole, Helene (CPSO#: 62007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Dept of Paediatric Surgery
1200 Main Street West
suite 4E8
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75244
Fax: (905) 521-9992
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Helene Flageole Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Flageole ( CPSO# 62007 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Dept of Paediatric General Surgery
1200 Main Street West
Suite 4E8
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELENE FLAGEOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLAGEOLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2007